+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, June 10, 2016, pending concurrence
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, May 27, 2016, pending concurrence
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor