+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 1, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5204
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
- Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 30, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing