+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (110)
Type:
Primary Sponsor