+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules