+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4726
- Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted
- Read third
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor