+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On September 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 182 of the Acts of 2020
On September 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the further House amendment
- Rules suspended
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4969
On July 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
- Rules suspended
- Read second
- Amended (Cyr) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2851
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 29, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On September 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H3974
- Reported from the committee on Financial Services