+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, April 29, 2016, pending concurrence
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor