+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 24, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security