+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4413
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 15, 2016, pending concurrence
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On March 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 1, 2016, pending concurrence
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2016 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Venture Development Center
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
+ − Sponsor
Charles D. Baker
Type:
Primary Sponsor