+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2019
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on the Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor