+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2016
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Passed to be engrossed
- Substituted for H3720
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Transfer Language Correction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor