+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4367
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules