+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On September 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 265 of the Acts of 2016
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On September 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On August 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to a third reading
- New draft of H3844
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Pending new draft of H3844
- Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Floor Amendment
+ − Sponsor
House Committee on Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor