+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On August 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H896
- Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture