+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2021
On September 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Substituted for H2168
- Passed to be engrossed