+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On October 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2017
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 23, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 23, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspsended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On October 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on the Judiciary
On September 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules