+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On September 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2016
On September 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor