+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules