+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor