+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House further amendment
- Rules suspended
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
- Bills in the Third Reading special report adopted
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommeded ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2055
- Rules suspended
- Read second
- Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2055, as amended
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read third
- Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #280 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 1]
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to be engrossed
- Amendment 1 adopted, as changed
- Motion to reconsider prevailed
- Passed to be engrossed - 145 YEAS to 4 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 295)
- Read third
+ − Vote
March 20, 2014: Senate Roll Call # 280
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
House Ways and Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor