+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2022
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted -see Roll Call #126 (38 Yeas - 0 Nays)
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 142 )
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to be engrossed
- Amended (Comerford) by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2629
- Read third
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor