+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 8, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5218
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday March 25, 2022, pending concurrence
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Transportation
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government