+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing