+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-enacted and again laid before the Governor
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-enacted
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's amendment adopted
- Rules suspended
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's amendment adopted (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading)
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- For message, see H3965
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 7, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to be engrossed
- Substituted for H3815
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act extending a certain property tax
exemption for seniors in the town of Sudbury
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor