+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (O'Connor Ives) adopted
On December 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service