+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2016 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On February 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/08/2016 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Education
On October 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor