+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 198 of the Acts of 2016
On July 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 30, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government