+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2016
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H1258
- Reported from the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Joint Committee on the Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor