+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2021
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H2564
- Reported from the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor