+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4793
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4793
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor