+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 12, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4683
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 31, 2018, pending concurrence
On September 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 12, 2017 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules