+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4256
- Bills in the Third Reading special report adopted
- Read third (title changed)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor