+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On August 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2014
On July 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted - Roll Call #440 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 470)
On July 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On July 29, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted
- Rules suspended
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2013 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On December 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regultory Oversight
+ − Vote
July 30, 2014: Senate Roll Call # 440
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor