+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 2, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4437
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On December 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Revenue
On November 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules