+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4128
- Read third
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor