+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2016 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On August 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor