+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On October 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2015
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On October 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules