+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Bills in the Third Reading special report adopted
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- New draft of H3769
- Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
Type:
Primary Sponsor