+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
- Read third
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor