+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor