+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in Virtual Hearing
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government