+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2022
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On December 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor