+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
On July 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On July 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
On July 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On November 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
- New draft of H417
- Reported from the committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor