+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill, H4246
- Read third
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 4, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules