+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2013
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
- Rules suspended
- Laid before the Governor
- Amendment (Rush) adopted
- Ordered to a third reading
- Read second
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Emergency preambele adopted
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 276)
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted - Roll Call #229 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
On November 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On October 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Vote
November 20, 2013: Senate Roll Call # 229
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor