+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 247 of the Acts of 2018
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On October 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue