+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2016
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 16, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government