+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2019
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor