+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4873
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 8, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday March 4, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor