+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 171 of the Acts of 2013
On November 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On November 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On October 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On September 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules